EP1069855 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRAINING VISUAL ATTENTION CAPABILITIES OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visual Awareness, Inc. 333 West Wacker Drive, Suite 700 Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | [2005/01] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Visual Resources, Inc. 814 Covington Street Bowling Green, KY 42103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALL, Karlene K. 201 Campbell Hall, 1300 University Boulevard Birmingham, AL 35294 / US | 02 /
BERG, Kristina, K. 1248 West Fletcher, Unit E Chicago, IL 60657 / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99916619.2 | 09.04.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999US07926 | Priority number, date | US19980081289P | 10.04.1998 Original published format: US 81289 P | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952419 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069855 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/00, A61H5/00, A61B3/032, A61B3/024 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A61B3/024 (EP,US);
A61H5/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/04] | A61B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Extension states | AL | 02.11.2000 | LT | 02.11.2000 | LV | 02.11.2000 | MK | 02.11.2000 | RO | 02.11.2000 | SI | 02.11.2000 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAINIEREN DER FÄHIGKEIT DER VISUELLEN AUFMERKSAMKEIT EINER PERSON | [2001/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRAINING VISUAL ATTENTION CAPABILITIES OF A SUBJECT | [2001/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL SERVANT A EXERCER LES CAPACITES D'ATTENTION VISUELLE D'UN SUJET | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2006 | 11.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/06] | 26.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.10.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5589897 (SINCLAIR STEPHEN H [US], et al) [A] 20-27 * column 5, line 23 - column 11, line 2; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0411821 (DYNAVISION INC [US]) [A] 20-27 * column 10, line 52 - column 12, line 15; figure 8 * | International search | [X]US4447141 (EISENKRAFT ARTHUR [US]); | [A]US4971434 (BALL KARLENE K [US]); | [A]US5469740 (FRENCH BARRY J [US], et al) |