EP0998916 - MEDICINAL COMPOSITIONS FOR APPLICATION TO MUCOSA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/40] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIBE, Yoshihisa, Teijin Limited Tokyo Research Center, 3-2, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Wataru, Teijin Limited Tokyo Research Center, 3-2, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | 03 /
KAWABE, Hiroyuki Teijin Limited, 1-1, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/40] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2001/11] | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/19] | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99917086.3 | 21.04.1999 | [2000/19] | WO1999JP02126 | Priority number, date | JP19980110887 | 21.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11088798 | JP19980110888 | 21.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11088898 | [2000/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953899 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998916 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998916 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K47/38, A61K47/02, A61K45/00, A61K31/40, A61K31/19, A61K31/35, A61K31/56, A61K38/23 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K31/35 (EP,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P5/22 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/186 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Extension states | AL | 04.02.2000 | LT | 04.02.2000 | LV | 04.02.2000 | MK | 04.02.2000 | RO | 04.02.2000 | SI | 04.02.2000 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR VERABREICHUNG AUF SCHLEIMHÄUTE | [2000/19] | English: | MEDICINAL COMPOSITIONS FOR APPLICATION TO MUCOSA | [2000/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS MEDICINALES A APPLIQUER SUR LA MUQUEUSE | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2000 | Translation filed | 07.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0496308 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4-10,13-19,22-24,26,27 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 11 ** page 4; examples 4,5 * | International search | [A]JPS63303931 (SUMITOMO PHARMA); | [A]JPH02262526 (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | [X]JPH07188059 (ROHTO PHARMA); | [X]JPH09235220 (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO [JP]) |