EP1076063 - NOVEL ASPARTAME DERIVATIVE CRYSTAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHISHITA, Akihiro, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 02 /
NAGASHIMA, Kazutaka, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 03 /
ISHIDA, Hirotoshi, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 04 /
NAGAI, Takeshi, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99917151.5 | 26.04.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999JP02199 | Priority number, date | JP19980125991 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: JP 12599198 | JP19980207605 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20760598 | [2001/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958553 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076063 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/075, C07K1/02, C07K5/06, A23L1/236 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
C07K5/06113 (EP,US);
C07K5/0613 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2001/07] | C07K5/075, C07K1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGER KRISTALL EINES ASPARTAMDERIVATS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/07] | English: | NOVEL ASPARTAME DERIVATIVE CRYSTAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2001/07] | French: | NOUVEAU CRISTAL DE DERIVE D'ASPARTAME ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2000 | Translation filed | 29.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/40] | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS59172444 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]JPS6037949 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]JPS6333396 (TOSOH CORP); | [A]JPS6344592 (TOSOH CORP); | [A]JPS63177774 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]JPH02243699 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]JPH0327398 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JPH03204895 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]JPH04346769 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]JPH09512809 |