EP0992519 - BLOCK COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Yoshiki c/o Kaneka Corporation Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0872 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Masayuki, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | 03 /
KITANO, Kenichi, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | 04 /
HIIRO, Tomoki, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | 05 /
KIMURA, Katsuhiko, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Yoshiki, c/o Kaneka Corporation 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0872 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJITA, Masayuki, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | |||
03 /
KITANO, Kenichi, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | |||
04 /
HIIRO, Tomoki, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | |||
05 /
KIMURA, Katsuhiko, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | |||
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Yoshiki, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJITA, Masayuki, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | |||
03 /
KITANO, Kenichi, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | |||
04 /
HIIRO, Tomoki, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | |||
05 /
KIMURA, Katsuhiko, Kobe Research Laboratories Kaneka Corp. 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ku 652-0872 / JP | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99917208.3 | 28.04.1999 | [2000/15] | WO1999JP02273 | Priority number, date | JP19980119291 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11929198 | JP19980147809 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14780998 | JP19980151571 | 01.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15157198 | JP19980207328 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20732898 | JP19980207329 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20732998 | JP19980234428 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23442898 | JP19980306233 | 28.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30623398 | [2000/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955751 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992519 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992519 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/02, C08F293/00, C08F297/00, C08L53/00, C08F4/00, C08K5/00, C08F2/38 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
C08F290/02 (EP,US);
C08F293/005 (EP,US);
C08F297/00 (EP,US);
C08F2438/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | C08F290/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/15] | Title | German: | BLOCKCOPOLYMER | [2000/15] | English: | BLOCK COPOLYMER | [2000/15] | French: | COPOLYMERE BLOC | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2000 | Translation filed | 21.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5312871 (MARDARE DANIELA [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14,18,24-27 * claims 14,15 ; examples 1-15 ; column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 62 *;; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO9718247 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]) [X] 1-14,18-32 * claims 1-33 ; page 36, line 3 - page 48, line 16 ; page 15, line 20 - page 17, line 14 *;; examples 1-35 *; | [A]WO9727233 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-32* claims 1-7 *; | [X]WO9801480 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]) [X] 1-32 * claims 1, 5, 2-4, 21-24, 26-28, 35, 19, 10-15 ; page 11, line 12 - page 13, line 4 ; page 16, line 16 - page 24, line 12 ; abstract ; page 10, line 22-26 ; examples 1-24 *; page 24, line 13 - page 43, line 22 * | International search | [A]JPS4721486 ; | [A]JPS52144086 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC); | [A]JPH02124914 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [A]JP7059601B |