EP1071866 - MULTI-PLATE HYDRAULIC MOTOR VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states White Hydraulics Inc. 110 Bill Bryan Boulevard Hopkinsville, KY 42240 / US | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Hollis, N. 243 Pyle Lane Hopkinsville, KY 42240 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Freischem, Stephan Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Freischem, Stephan, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Freischem An Gross St. Martin 2 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99917312.3 | 16.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US06532 | Priority number, date | US19980062318 | 20.04.1998 Original published format: US 62318 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954596 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071866 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/10, F04C2/10 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
F04C2/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | F01C1/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/05] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES MASCHINENVENTIL MIT MEHREREN SCHEIBEN | [2001/05] | English: | MULTI-PLATE HYDRAULIC MOTOR VALVE | [2001/05] | French: | SOUPAPE DE MOTEUR HYDRAULIQUE A PLATEAUX MULTIPLES | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3572983 (MCDERMOTT HUGH L); | [A]US3826596 (HANSEN G, et al); | [A]US4139335 (WUSTHOF PETER, et al); | [A]US4449898 (LAMBECK RAYMOND P [US]); | [A]US4533302 (BEGLEY BENJAMIN D [US]); | [A]US4881880 (DLUGOKECKI ANDREW N [US]); | [A]US5137438 (MILLER LAURENCE L [US]) | by applicant | US4285643 | US4357133 | US4697997 | US5173043 | US3572983 | US4390329 | US4480972 | US4285653 | US4362479 | US3862814 | US4533302 |