EP1089874 - LOW $g(k) DIELECTRIC INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID FILMS AND METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Aviza Technology, Inc. 440 Kings Village Road Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Thermal Acquisition Corp. 440 Kings Village Road Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | ||
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states ASML US, Inc. 2240 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131-1716 / US | ||
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Silicon Valley Group, Inc. Suite 400, 101 Metro Drive San Jose, CA 95110 / US | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Silicon Valley Group Thermal Systems LLC 440 Kings Village Road Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Peter 1095 Middleton Drive Boulder Creek, CA 95006 / US | 02 /
LOPATA, Eugene 123 Sunset Terrace Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | 03 /
FELTS, John 2624 Calhoune Street Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Ian Robert, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Lambert, Ian Robert, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/50] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2002/48] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al European Patent Attorney Mewburn Ellis 1 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6NP / GB | ||
Former [2001/15] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99917529.2 | 15.04.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999US08246 | Priority number, date | US19980067704 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: US 67704 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955526 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089874 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/04, H05H1/24, C23C16/00, C23C16/40, H01L21/316 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
B32B9/04 (KR);
H01L21/3125 (US);
C23C16/30 (EP,US);
C23C16/401 (EP,US);
H01L21/02126 (EP,US);
H01L21/02216 (EP,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,US);
H01L21/3121 (US);
H01L21/3122 (US);
H01L21/3124 (US);
H01L21/31633 (US);
H01L21/02211 (EP);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/00 (EP,US);
C09D4/00, C08G77/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2001/15] | B32B9/04, H05H1/24, C23C16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Nieder-$g(k) anorganische/organische dielektrische Hybridfilme und Herstellungsverfahren dazu | [2001/15] | English: | LOW $g(k) DIELECTRIC INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID FILMS AND METHOD OF MAKING | [2001/15] | French: | FILM DIELECTRIQUE HYBRIDE ORGANIQUE/MINERAL A FAIBLE $g(k) ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/05] | 10.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2005 | 30.04.2010 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2010 | 30.04.2012 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2012 | 30.04.2013 | 15   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2014 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NARA A ET AL, "LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT INSULATOR FORMED BY DOWNSTREATM PLASMA CVD AT ROOM TEMPERATURE USING TMS/O2", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (199703), vol. 36, no. 3B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 1477 - 1480, XP000861558 [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.36.1477 | [A] - SUGAHARA G ET AL, "LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT CARBON CONTAINING SIO2 FILMS DEPOSITED BY PECVD TECHNIQUE USING A NOVEL CVD PRECURSOR", DUMIC CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, XX, XX, (19970210), pages 19 - 25, XP000950049 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - SAHLI S, ET AL., "PROPERTIES OF PLASMA-POLYSILOXANE DEPOSITED BY PECVD", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, LAUSANNE, CH, CH, (19930101), vol. 33, doi:10.1016/0254-0584(93)90099-8, pages 106 - 109, XP002921829 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0254-0584(93)90099-8 | [A] - INOUE Y, TAKAI O, "Spectroscopic Studies on Preparation of Silicon Oxide Films by PECVD Using Organosilicon Compounds", HCAPLUS, (19000101), Database accession no. 1996:453637, XP002921830 |