EP1070227 - HEAD FOR CHECKING LINEAR DIMENSIONS OF PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARPOSS SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio BO / IT | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELLI, Franco Via Guicciardini, 17 I-40069 Zola Predosa / IT | 02 /
CARLI, Carlo Via Mascheraio, 30 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Tamburini, Lucio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Tamburini, Lucio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio / IT | Application number, filing date | 99917951.8 | 29.03.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999EP02257 | Priority number, date | IT1998BO00219 | 06.04.1998 Original published format: IT BO980219 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951935 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070227 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070227 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/012 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
G01B5/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | MESSTASTER ZUR VERIFIKATION DER LINEARDIMENSIONEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [2001/04] | English: | HEAD FOR CHECKING LINEAR DIMENSIONS OF PARTS | [2001/04] | French: | TETE DE VERIFICATION DES DIMENSIONS LINEAIRES DE PIECES | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 20.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.12.2001 | DK | 19.03.2002 | SE | 19.03.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/06] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3407551 (FRENCO VERZAHNUNGSLEHREN [DE]) [A] 1-5,13,16,24-27 * see the introduction; * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 1; figures 1-11 *; | [A]WO8804401 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [A] 1,11,13,16 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]EP0731333 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1,19* column 2, line 7 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-3 * |