blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1079727

EP1079727 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF LESIONS AND THERAPEUTIC SUCCESS BY FLOW DISTURBANCES ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.04.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2001Surcharge for renewal fee 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Florence Medical Ltd.
Sharona Center, Derech Hasharon 12
Kfar-Saba 44269 / IL
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / TOLKOWSKY, Gideon
Enzio Sireni Street 3
46735 Herzlia Pituach / IL
02 / DGANY, Elhanan
Gordon Street 14
44260 Kfar Saba / IL
03 / SHALMAN, Evgeny
Adirim Street 5/4
39088 Tel Aviv / IL
04 / NOSKOWICZ, Simon, Henri
Herzl Street 22/22
44444 Kfar Saba / IL
05 / BARAK, Chen
Bareket Street 18
73142 Shoham / IL
06 / ORTENBERG, Michael
Hagenev Street 60/2
40300 Kfar Yona / IL
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Murray, Elisabeth Anne, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]Simons, Elisabeth Anne, et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date99918253.804.05.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999IL00233
Priority number, dateUS19980084179P04.05.1998         Original published format: US 84179 P
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9956612
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1079727
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/0215
[2001/18]
CPC:
A61B5/02158 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/10]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION UND CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON LÄSIONEN MIT THERAPEUTISCHEM ERFOLG MITTELS ANALYSE VON STRÖMUNGSSTÖRUNGEN[2001/10]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF LESIONS AND THERAPEUTIC SUCCESS BY FLOW DISTURBANCES ANALYSIS[2001/10]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE CARACTERISATION DE LESIONS ET DE SUCCES THERAPEUTIQUE PAR L'ANALYSE DE PERTURBATIONS DE DEBIT[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2000National basic fee paid 
04.12.2000Search fee paid 
04.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
28.03.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/21]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5178153  (EINZIG ROBERT E [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.