EP1089335 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANO, Masashi Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Nobuaki Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Shinichi Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99918314.8 | 30.04.1999 | [2001/14] | WO1999JP02357 | Priority number, date | JP19980138691 | 20.05.1998 Original published format: JP 13869198 | JP19980138692 | 20.05.1998 Original published format: JP 13869298 | JP19980246023 | 31.08.1998 Original published format: JP 24602398 | [2001/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960626 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089335 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48, H01L23/495, H05K3/34 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01L21/565 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85181 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12043 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85181, H01L2224/48465 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12043, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2001/14] | H01L23/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2001/14] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG | [2001/14] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2001/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2000 | Translation filed | 10.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/19] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5706177 (NATHER HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1,12-15,20-25 * the whole document *[A] 2-5,8,9,16,17 | International search | [Y]JPH05243442 (NEC CORP); | [X]JPH0799277 (SHARP KK) |