EP1141347 - CO-EXPRESSION OF PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW MEXICO STATE UNIVERSITY TECHNOLOGY TRANSFER CORPORATION Box 30001, MSC 3RES Las Cruces, NM 88003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states NEW MEXICO STATE UNIVERSITY TECHNOLOGY TRANSFER CORPORATION Box 30001, MSC 3RES Las Cruces, NM 88003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAGGA, Suman 3138 Las Placitas Road Las Cruces, NM 88011 / US | 02 /
SENGUPTA-GOPALAN, Champa 3059 Camino Real Las Cruces, NM 88001 / US | 03 /
KEMP, John, D. 6760 Raasaf Drive Las Cruces, NM 88005 / US | [2002/06] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
BAGGA, Suman 415 West College Avenue 3 Las Cruces, NM 88005 / US | ||
02 /
SENGUPTA-GOPALAN, Champa 3059 Camino Real Las Cruces, NM 88001 / US | |||
03 /
KEMP, John, D. 6760 Raasaf Drive Las Cruces, NM 88005 / US | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99918663.8 | 16.04.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999US08525 | Priority number, date | US19980224655 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: US 224655 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040738 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141347 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/425, C12N15/29, C12N15/62, C07K16/16, C07K16/38, A01H5/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/8254 (EP);
C07K14/425 (EP);
C12N15/8251 (EP);
C12N15/8253 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | COEXPRESSION VON PROTEINEN | [2001/41] | English: | CO-EXPRESSION OF PROTEINS | [2001/41] | French: | CO-EXPRESSION DES PROTEINES | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9728247 (BIOCEM ;LUDEVID DOLORES (ES); TORRENT MARGARITA (ES); ALVAREZ INAK) [X] 1,7,12 * page 2, line 3-6; page 4, line 22-27; page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 3; page 11, line 11; page 37-40; page 46; claim 18 * [Y] 2-4,8-10,13-15,17-19; | [XY] - BAGGA, S., ET AL., "genetic engineering for enhancing the sulphur amino acids in forage legumes", SUPPLEMENT TO PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (199606), vol. 111, no. 2, page 166, XP002077183 [X] 1,6,7,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,8-10,13-15,17-19 | [XY] - BAGGA S ET AL, "ACCUMULATION OF 15-KILODALTON ZEIN IN NOVEL PROTEIN BODIES IN TRANSGENIC TOBACCO", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 107, pages 13 - 23, XP002070069 [X] 1,6,7,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,8-10,13-15,17-19 | [XY] - GELI M I ET AL, "TWO STRUCTURAL DOMAINS MEDIATE TWO SEQUENTIAL EVENTS IN GAMMA-ZEIN TARGETING: PROTEIN ENDOPLASMIC RETICULUM RETENTION AND PROTEIN BODY FORMATION", PLANT CELL, (199412), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 1911 - 1922, XP002017847 [X] 1,6,7,12 * abstract, page 1991, right column; page 1912, right column; Fig. 2B; page 1914, right column; Fig. 5; page 1918 right column - page 1919 * [Y] 2-4,8-10,13-15,17-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.6.12.1911 | [XY] - BAGGA, S., ET AL., "coexpression of maize delta-Zein and beta-Zein genes results in stable accumulation of delta-Zein in endoplasmatic reticulum-derived protein bodies formed by beta-Zein", THE PLANT CELL, (199709), vol. 9, pages 1683 - 1696, XP002077186 [X] 1,5-7,11,12,16 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,8-10,13-15,17-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.9.9.1683 | [Y] - HANCOCK, K.R., ET AL., "identification of sulphur-rich proteins which resist rumen degradation and are hydrolysed rapidly by intestinal proteases", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (199412), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 855 - 863, XP002077184 [Y] 2-4,8-10,13-15,17-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/BJN19940090 | [A] - COLEMAN, C.E., ET AL., "the maize gamma-Zein sequesters alpha-Zein and stabilizes its accumulation in protein bodies of transgenic tobacco endosperm", THE PLANT CELL, (199612), vol. 8, pages 2335 - 2345, XP002077185 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.8.12.2335 |