EP1082705 - MULTI-PLANAR VOLUMETRIC DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION USSING THREE-DIMENSIONAL ANTI-ALIASING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LightSpace Technologies, Inc. 2374 Edison Blvd Twinsburg OH 44087-2376 / US | [2008/19] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states LightSpace Technologies, Inc. 26 Pearl Street Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states LightSpace Technologies AB Tunavägen 281 781 73 Borlänge / SE | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Dimensional Media Associates 22 West 19 Street New York, NY 10011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, Alan 25 Highview Place White Plains, NY 10604 / US | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Zeitler, Giselher, et al Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Zeitler, Giselher, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Zeitler & Dickel Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99918696.8 | 20.04.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999US08618 | Priority number, date | US19980082442P | 20.04.1998 Original published format: US 82442 P | US19980196553 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: US 196553 | US19990291315 | 14.04.1999 Original published format: US 291315 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954849 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082705 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
G06T15/00 (EP,KR,US);
G02B30/52 (EP,US);
G09G3/003 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N13/388 (EP,US);
H04N13/395 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | MULTIPLANARES VOLUMETRISCHES ANZEIGESYSTEM UND DREIDIMENSIONALES ANTI-ALIASINGVERWENDENDES BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2001/11] | English: | MULTI-PLANAR VOLUMETRIC DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION USSING THREE-DIMENSIONAL ANTI-ALIASING | [2001/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE PRESENTATION D'IMAGES VOLUMETRIQUES SUR PLUSIEURS PLANS ET SON MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT A ANTI-CRENELAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 26.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4670744 (BUZAK THOMAS S [US]) [X] 34,35* figures 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [X] - HALLE M W, "Holographic stereograms as discrete imaging systems", PRACTICAL HOLOGRAPHY VIII, SAN JOSE, CA, USA, 7-9 FEB. 1994, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1994, USA, vol. 2176, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 73 - 84, XP008007475 [X] 1,5 * page 79, paragraph 7. - page 83, paragraph 9.; figures 10A-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.172620 | International search | [A]US4835712 (DREBIN ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]US4879668 (CLINE HARVEY E [US], et al); | [A]US5005578 (GREER DOUGLAS S [US], et al); | [A]US5201035 (STYTZ MARTIN R [US], et al); | [A]US5317689 (NACK MYRON L [US], et al); | [A]US5497453 (MEGAHED ABRAHAM E [US], et al); | [A]US5499323 (DOI AKIO [JP], et al); | [A]US5552934 (PRINCE JONATHAN [US]); | [Y]US5572375 (CRABTREE IV ALLEN F [US]); | [A]US5594652 (PENN STEVEN M [US], et al); | [A]US5671136 (WILLHOIT JR LOUIS E [US]); | [A]US5684935 (DEMESA III NICANOR P [US], et al); | [A]US5734384 (YANOF JEFFREY H [US], et al); | [YP]US5745197 (LEUNG MARTIN S [US], et al); | [AP]US5807448 (NAKAZAWA HIDEKI [JP]); | [AP]US5831623 (NEGISHI HIROYASU [JP], et al); | [XP]US5847711 (KAUFMAN ARIE E [US], et al) |