EP1075508 - ENZYMATIC NUCLEIC ACID TREATMENT OF DISEASES OR CONDITIONS RELATED TO HEPATITIS C VIRUS INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/07] | ENZYMATIC NUCLEIC ACIDS MOLECULES WHICH MODULATE THE EXPRESSIONS AND/OR REPLICATION OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS | ||
[2001/34] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIBOZYME PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 2950 Wilderness Place Boulder, CO 80301-5411 / US | [2001/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATT, Lawrence 2176 Riverside Lane Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 02 /
MCSWIGGEN, James, A. 4866 Franklin Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 03 /
ROBERTS, Elisabeth 10025 Eliot Circle Federal Heights, CO 80221 / US | 04 /
PAVCO, Pamela, A. 705 Barberry Circle Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | 05 /
MACEJAK, Dennis 6595 Union Street Arvada, CO 80004 / US | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/07] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99918837.8 | 26.04.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999US09027 | Priority number, date | US19980083217P | 27.04.1998 Original published format: US 83217 P | US19980100842P | 18.09.1998 Original published format: US 100842 P | US19990257608 | 25.02.1999 Original published format: US 257608 | US19990274553 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: US 274553 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9955847 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1075508 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C12N15/1131 (EP);
C12N9/00 (KR);
C12N2310/121 (EP);
C12N2310/122 (EP);
C12N2310/315 (EP);
C12N2310/317 (EP);
C12N2310/321 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/21, A61K2300/00 (EP);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHE NUKLEINSÄURE ZUR HEMMUNG DER EXPRIMIERUNG UND/ODER REPLIKATION DES HEPATITIS C-VIRUS | [2001/07] | English: | ENZYMATIC NUCLEIC ACID TREATMENT OF DISEASES OR CONDITIONS RELATED TO HEPATITIS C VIRUS INFECTION | [2001/34] | French: | TRAITEMENT PAR ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ENZYMATIQUES DE MALADIES OU DE TROUBLES LIES A UNE INFECTION PAR LE VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE C | [2001/07] |
Former [2001/07] | ENZYMATIC NUCLEIC ACIDS MOLECULES WHICH MODULATE THE EXPRESSIONS AND/OR REPLICATION OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 03.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 08.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9519429 (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1,3-31,33-42 * the whole document *; | [PX] - ROBERTS, E. C. (1) ET AL, "Synthesis and testing of nuclease resistant hammerhead ribozymes directed against hepatitis C virus RNA.", HEPATOLOGY, (OCT., 1998) VOL. 28, NO. 4 PART 2, PP. 398A. MEETING INFO.: BIENNIAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE INT. ASS. FOR THE STUDY OF THE LIVER AND THE 49TH ANN. MEETING, NOV. 4-10, 1998. ISSN: 0270-9139., XP002127080 [PX] 1,3-31,33-42 * abstract * | [A] - CHRISTOFFERSEN R E ET AL, "RIBOZYMES AS HUMAN THERAPEUTIC AGENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, vol. 38, no. 12, ISSN 0022-2623, page 2023-2037, XP002062054 [A] 1,3-31,33-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00012a001 |