EP1075471 - INDOLYL DERIVATIVES AS SEROTONERGIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | ||
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLY, Michael, Gerard 19 Clinton Court Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
KANG, Young, Hee 324 Andover Place Robbinsville, NJ 08691 / US | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Connelly, Michael John, et al C/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Connelly, Michael John, et al c/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99918860.0 | 28.04.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999US09129 | Priority number, date | US19980069045 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: US 69045 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955694 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075471 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075471 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, A61K31/445 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D209/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Extension states | AL | 02.10.2000 | LT | 02.10.2000 | LV | 02.10.2000 | RO | 02.10.2000 | SI | 02.10.2000 | Title | German: | INDOLDERIVATE ALS SEROTONERGISCHE MITTEL | [2001/07] | English: | INDOLYL DERIVATIVES AS SEROTONERGIC AGENTS | [2001/07] | French: | DERIVES D'INDOLYLE UTILISES COMME AGENTS SEROTONINERGIQUES | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9533721 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [Y] 1-15 * pages 37-39; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9623784 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * pages 18-19; table 4 *; | [PY]WO9828293 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [PY] 1-15 * page 4 *; | [DA] - K. FRETER ET AL., "4-(indolyl-3)-1-(benzimidazolonylalkyl)-piperidines, a novel group of potential antiallergy compounds", ARZNEIM.-FORSCH./DRUG RES., (1985), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 272 - 276, XP002111572 [DA] 1-15 * example 9 * |