EP1107835 - ROLLING STAND WITH CROSSING BACK-UP AND/OR WORKING ROLLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAMBUSCH, Herbert Agnes-Miegel-Str. 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99919049.9 | 02.03.1999 | [2001/25] | WO1999DE00628 | Priority number, date | DE1998140538 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19840538 | [2001/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012236 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1107835 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1107835 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/02, B21B31/18 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
B21B31/185 (EP,US);
B21B31/18 (KR);
B21B13/023 (EP,US);
B21B13/02 (EP,US);
B21B2013/025 (EP,US);
B21B2203/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/25] | Title | German: | WALZGERÜST MIT GEKREUZTEN STÜTZ- UND/ODER ARBEITSWALZEN | [2001/25] | English: | ROLLING STAND WITH CROSSING BACK-UP AND/OR WORKING ROLLS | [2001/25] | French: | CAGE DE LAMINOIR DOTEE DE CYLINDRES D'APPUI ET/OU DE TRAVAIL CROISES | [2001/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04361802 ; | [A]JPS56131004 ; | [PA]EP0893169 (DEMAG ITALIMPIANTI SPA [IT]) [PA] 1-4,6-8 * column 4 - column 10; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930512), vol. 017, no. 233, Database accession no. (M - 1407), & JP04361802 A 19921215 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820121), vol. 006, no. 010, Database accession no. (M - 107), & JP56131004 A 19811014 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19510694U | EP0525552 |