EP1066256 - THE USE OF DERIVATIVES OF 2-OXOPYRROLE AS CROP PROTECTION AGENTS AND NOVEL 2-OXOPYRROLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Oliver Rossinistrasse 7 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
OTTEN, Martina Gunterstrasse 28 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 04 /
WALTER, Helmut Grünstadter Strasse 82 D-67283 Obrigheim / DE | 05 /
HARRIES, Volker Immengärtenweg 29e D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2001/02] | Application number, filing date | 99919137.2 | 24.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999EP02006 | Priority number, date | DE1998114040 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19814040 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950243 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066256 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/44, C07D403/10, C07D401/06, C07D403/06, C07D405/06, C07D413/06, C07D409/06, C07D417/06, C07D207/38, A01N43/36 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
C07D207/44 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
C07D207/38 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DERIVATEN DES 2-OXOPYRROLS ALS PFLANZENSCHUTZMITTEL UND NEUE 2-OXOPYRROLE | [2001/02] | English: | THE USE OF DERIVATIVES OF 2-OXOPYRROLE AS CROP PROTECTION AGENTS AND NOVEL 2-OXOPYRROLES | [2001/02] | French: | UTILISATION DE DERIVES DE 2-OXOPYRROL COMME AGENTS PHYTOSANITAIRES ET NOUVEAUX 2-OXOPYRROLS | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 29.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0081162 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * claim - *; | [A]EP0022551 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0403891 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * claim - *; | [A]EP0184981 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,4,5 * claim - * | [Y] - LOVREN F. ET AL., "Reaktivität und mikrobiologische Aktivität von 2-Methyl-3-carbethoxy-5-pyrrolinon-Derivaten", PHARMAZIE., VEB VERLAG VOLK UND GESUNDHEIT. BERLIN., DD, (1992), vol. 47, no. 10, ISSN 0031-7144, pages 773 - 776, XP002111151 [Y] 1,4,5 * the whole document * | [Y] - LOVREN F. ET AL., "Synthesis and properties of 2-methyl-3-(ethoxycarbonyl)-4-benzylidene-5-pyrrolinones", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930315), vol. 118, no. 11, Database accession no. 101746, XP002111153 [Y] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [ ] - FARM. VESTN. (LJUBLJANA), (1992), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 159 - 165 | [Y] - LEKIC M. ET AL., "Identification of pyrrolinones and their benzylidene derivatives by mass spectroscopy", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871221), vol. 107, no. 25, Database accession no. 235876, XP002111154 [Y] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [ ] - VESTN. SLOV. KEM. DRUS., (1986), vol. 33, pages 251 - 255 | [DY] - RAMAIAH D. ET AL., "Interesting phototransformations of aziridylmaleates and -fumarates. Steady-state and laser flash photolysis studies", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON., US, (19921023), vol. 57, no. 22, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 6032 - 6037, XP002111152 [DY] 1,4,5 * page 6034; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00048a045 |