Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1067992
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.10.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
10.10.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
05.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.02.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
10.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
01.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
31.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|