Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002509778 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 | EP9902137 | 29.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1067992 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2003 | B1 | EP1067992 | 17.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 | EP9902137 | 29.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59907870D1 | 08.01.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 | EP9902137 | 29.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0101202 | 28.09.2001 | A3 | HUP0101202 | 28.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 | EP9902137 | 29.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6457556 | 01.10.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 | EP9902137 | 29.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9949939 | Global Dossier | 07.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ299643 | 01.10.2008 | B6 | CZ20003563 | 17.01.2001 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29805788U | 30.07.1998 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE29805788 | 30.03.1998 |