EP1086183 - AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC 20 Manchester Square London W1U 3AN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Imperial Chemical Industries PLC 20 Manchester Square London W1U 3AN / GB | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODE, Daniel 2157 West 38th Street Cleveland, OH 44113 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, Deborah 78 Sycamore Road Kingsbury, Tamworth B78 2JL / GB | 03 /
BRADLEY, Christopher 141 Barrows Lane Yardley, Birmingham B25 1SE / GB | 04 /
BELTON, Martin 10 Hole Farm Way Hawkesley, Birmingham B38 9RW / GB | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Cooper, Alan Victor, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O. Box 1883, Wexham Road Slough PDO, Berkshire SL2 5FD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Cooper, Alan Victor, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Group Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 1883, Wexham Road Slough PDO, Berkshire SL2 5FD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99919183.6 | 30.03.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999EP02279 | Priority number, date | GB19980007213 | 04.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9807213 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951696 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086183 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086183 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D151/00, C08F283/01, C08F290/14 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C08F290/144 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/062 (KR);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C09D151/003 (EP,KR,US);
C09D163/10 (KR);
C09D4/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C09D151/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/13] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION | [2001/13] | French: | COMPOSITION AQUEUSE DE REVETEMENT | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2004 | BE | 23.06.2004 | CH | 23.06.2004 | FI | 23.06.2004 | LI | 23.06.2004 | DK | 23.09.2004 | SE | 23.09.2004 | PT | 23.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/22] | AT | 23.06.2004 | |
BE | 23.06.2004 | ||
CH | 23.06.2004 | ||
FI | 23.06.2004 | ||
LI | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 23.06.2004 | |
BE | 23.06.2004 | ||
CH | 23.06.2004 | ||
FI | 23.06.2004 | ||
LI | 23.06.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 23.06.2004 | |
CH | 23.06.2004 | ||
FI | 23.06.2004 | ||
LI | 23.06.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 23.06.2004 | |
FI | 23.06.2004 | ||
LI | 23.06.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 23.06.2004 | |
LI | 23.06.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 23.06.2004 | |
LI | 23.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4212781 (EVANS JAMES M [US], et al) [DA] 1-14* claims 1-75 *; | [DY]US4683273 (BODE DANIEL [US]) [DY] 1-14 * column 1, line 54 - column 4, line 65 ; column 5, line 67-68 ; column 5, line 7-62*; column 6, lines 59-66 *; | [A]EP0622417 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,3 ; page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 3 ; page 4, line 19-24 *; page 2, lines 28-36 *; | [A]EP0629643 (GLIDDEN COMPANY FORMERLY KNOWN [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, lines 9-22 *; | [Y]EP0640654 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-3 ; page 4, line 29-51 ; page 4, line 19-24 ; page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 21 *; page 5, line 9 *; | [DY]US5464885 (CRAUN GARY P [US]) [DY] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5532297 (WOO JAMES T K [US], et al) [DY] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5648410 (HILLE HANS DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 59 *; column 5, lines 29-39; claims 1-33 *; | [Y]WO9730097 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line 24 ; page 15, line 8-9 ; page 17, line 16 - page 18, line 2 *; page 22, lines 19-21 * |