Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3724299 | Global Dossier | 06.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | ZA984212 | 19.05.1998 | IB9900898 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1084280 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA984212 | 19.05.1998 | IB9900898 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2332520 | 09.06.2009 | C | CA2332520 | 25.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA984212 | 19.05.1998 | IB9900898 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20005843L | 17.01.2001 | L | NO20005843D0 | 17.11.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | ZA984212 | 19.05.1998 | IB9900898 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6579504 | 17.06.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | ZA984212 | 19.05.1998 | IB9900898 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200006600 | 16.05.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | ZA200006600 | 14.11.2000 | ZA984212 | 19.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9960178 | Global Dossier | 25.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA984212 | 19.05.1998 |