EP1084280 - HYDROMETALLURGICAL TREATMENT PROCESS FOR EXTRACTION OF PLATINUM GROUP METALS OBVIATING THE MATTE SMELTING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liddell, Keith Stuart Forrest Centre, Level 28, 221 St George's Terrace Perth, W.A. 6000 / AU | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99919460.8 | 19.05.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999IB00898 | Priority number, date | ZA19980004212 | 19.05.1998 Original published format: ZA 9804212 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960178 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084280 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/06, C22B3/06, C22B3/42 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
C22B11/06 (EP,US);
C22B11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2001/12] | Title | German: | HYDROMETALLURGISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON PLATINMETALLEN OHNE EINSCHMELZEN EINER MATTE | [2001/12] | English: | HYDROMETALLURGICAL TREATMENT PROCESS FOR EXTRACTION OF PLATINUM GROUP METALS OBVIATING THE MATTE SMELTING PROCESS | [2001/12] | French: | TRAITEMENT HYDROMETALLURGIQUE RENDANT INUTILE LE PROCESSUS DE FUSION POUR MATTE DANS UN PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION DE METAUX DE LA MINE DE PLATINE | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/05] | 29.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1078453 (INT NICKEL CANADA) [A] 5 * page 1, line 9 - line 17 * * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 2 *; | [YA]US4108639 (LAKE MALCOLM JOHN, et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 17 * * column 2, line 38 - line 56 * * column 3, line 23 - line 45 * * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 13 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 61 * * figure -; claims 1,15,16 * [A] 7; | [A]US5238662 (DUBROVSKY MICHAEL [US]) [A] 2,8,9 * column 1, line 12 - line 18 * * column 10, line 5 - line 26 * * figure - *; | [YA]US5364444 (MCDOULETT JR C DALE [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 1, line 45 - line 64 * * column 2, line 36 - line 55 * * column 3, line 11 - line 45 * * figure .; examples 10,11; claims 1,2,4-7,10,11,14 * [A] 2,6; | [A] - FLEMING C A, "HYDROMETALLURGY OF PRECIOUS METALS RECOVERY", HYDROMETALLURGY, (19920601), vol. 30, no. 1 / 03, ISSN 0304-386X, pages 127 - 162, XP000382331 [A] 1-3 * Refractory Gold and Silver ores General ; Roasting ; Pressure leaching.; page 148 - page 156 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-386X(92)90081-A |