Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1077964
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
08.08.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
16.08.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
31.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.11.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
21.09.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
28.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.01.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
12.01.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
19.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|