EP1002381 - HANDOFF METHOD IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | ||
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Su Won 1662-9 Shillim 8-dong, Kwanak-gu Seoul 151-018 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Soon Young Karakhalra Apt. 3-407, 165, Karak-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-160 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Jae Min Puleunsamho Apt. 109-303, Irwonpon-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-239 / KR | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99919699.1 | 13.05.1999 | [2000/21] | WO1999KR00240 | Priority number, date | KR19980017277 | 13.05.1998 Original published format: KR 9817277 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9959255 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1002381 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002381 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/02 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
H04W36/18 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B7/022 (EP,BR,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04W36/08 (EP,BR,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | WEITERREICHUNGSVERFAHREN IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT SENDE-DIVERSITY | [2000/21] | English: | HANDOFF METHOD IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY | [2000/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE SUPPORTANT UNE DIVERSITE DE TRANSMISSION | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0347396 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]US5317623 (SAKAMOTO MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5577047 (PERSSON BENGT [SE], et al); | [AP]EP0883319 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [AP]WO9907174 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al); | [AP]US5898924 (MUELLER WILHELM DIPL ING [DE], et al); | [AT]WO9929133 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | WO9532558 | EP0744841 |