Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1068575
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.03.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
04.12.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
31.05.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
12.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
01.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
08.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
01.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|