Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3741399 | Global Dossier | 01.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9907001 | 09.04.1999 | US5746898 | 09.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1068575 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9907001 | 09.04.1999 | US5746898 | 09.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9953412 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2000 | A9 | WO9953412 | 21.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5746898 | 09.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR014838 | 28.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5746898 | 09.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO4880826 | 31.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5746898 | 09.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW424183B | 01.03.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | US5746898 | 09.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6185667 | 06.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5746898 | 09.04.1998 |