EP1072004 - HIGH PERFORMANCE OBJECT CACHE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inktomi Corporation 4100 East Third Avenue Forster City California 94404 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Inktomi Corporation 4100 East Third Avenue Forster City, California 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTIS, Peter 2537 15th Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 02 /
PLEVYAK, John 126 Baker Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 03 /
HAINES, Matthew 35 Corthell Road Laramie, WY 82070 / US | 04 /
BEGUELIN, Adam 2821 Holland Street San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 05 /
TOTTY, Brian 519 30th Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 06 /
GOURLEY, David 215 First Street, Fifth Floor Mail Box#236 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2001/20] |
Former [2001/05] | 01 /
MATTIS, Peter 1821 Hillman Avenue Belmont, CA 94002 / US | ||
02 /
PLEVYAK, John 126 Baker Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | |||
03 /
HAINES, Matthew 35 Corthell Road Laramie, WY 82070 / US | |||
04 /
BEGUELIN, Adam 2821 Holland Street San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
05 /
TOTTY, Brian 715 Catamaran 3 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
06 /
GOURLEY, David 2721 Midtown Court 211 Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99919847.6 | 15.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US08281 | Priority number, date | US19980060866 | 15.04.1998 Original published format: US 60866 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953422 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072004 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1072004 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
G06F16/9574 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US);
Y10S707/955 (US);
Y10S707/99944 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/05] | Title | German: | SEHR LEISTUNGSSTARKER OBJEKTCACHE | [2001/05] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE OBJECT CACHE | [2001/05] | French: | ANTEMEMOIRE OBJET HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0811939 (WEBTV NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract ** column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 49 *; | [A]US5732267 (SMITH MATTHEW W [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 32 *; | [A]EP0834819 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 57 * |