EP1072180 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT INTERCOUPLING COMPONENT WITH HEAT SINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED INTERCONNECTIONS CORPORATION 5 Energy Way West Warwick Rhode Island 02893 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states ADVANCED INTERCONNECTIONS CORPORATION 5 Energy Way West Warwick Rhode Island 02893 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, James, V. 28 Ladderhook Road Warwick, RI 02886 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99919895.5 | 16.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US08545 | Priority number, date | US19980062215 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: US 62215 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956515 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072180 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H01L23/32 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
H01L23/32 (EP,US);
H01L23/4006 (EP,US);
H01L2023/405 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4062 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4068 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4087 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, LI [2001/05] | Title | German: | IC-FASSUNG MIT KÜHLKÖRPER | [2001/05] | English: | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT INTERCOUPLING COMPONENT WITH HEAT SINK | [2001/05] | French: | COMPOSANT D'INTERCOUPLAGE DE CIRCUITS INTEGRES A PUITS THERMIQUE | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 01.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0449150 (LABINAL COMPONENTS & SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 56 - column 13, line 34; figure 6 * [A] 8-17,22-24 [Y] 2-7,18-21; | [Y]JPH04139753 ; | [A]JPH05326091 ; | [A]US5313099 (TATA PETER D [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920902), vol. 016, no. 415, Database accession no. (E - 1257), & JP04139753 A 19920513 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 2-7,18-21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940308), vol. 018, no. 139, Database accession no. (E - 1519), & JP05326091 A 19931210 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5019940 (CLEMENS DONALD L [US]); | [A]US5671121 (MCMAHON JOHN FRANCIS [US]) |