EP1073940 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING ERROR CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road, M/S UPAL 01-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 901 San Antonio Road, M/S UPAL 01-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 901 San Antonio Road, M/S UPAL01-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANKO, James, G. 2746 Ohio Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
RUBERG, Alan, T. 605 Emerald Bay Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Harris, Ian Richard D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99919917.7 | 20.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999US08646 | Priority number, date | US19980063342 | 20.04.1998 Original published format: US 63342 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9954802 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1073940 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073940 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/1462 (EP,US);
G06F11/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEHLERKORREKTUR | [2001/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING ERROR CORRECTION | [2001/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CORRECTION D'ERREURS | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | FI | 31.07.2002 | GR | 31.07.2002 | IT | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | NL | 31.07.2002 | DK | 31.10.2002 | SE | 31.10.2002 | PT | 18.11.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | CY | 20.04.2003 | LU | 20.04.2003 | IE | 21.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
CY | 20.04.2003 | ||
LU | 20.04.2003 | ||
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
CY | 20.04.2003 | ||
LU | 20.04.2003 | ||
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
LU | 20.04.2003 | ||
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FI | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 31.07.2002 | |
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0661634 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-28* column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 37 *; | [X]US5664091 (KEEN HENRY D [US]) [X] 1-5,11,15-19,25 * claim 1 * |