EP1077913 - PROCESS FOR SELECTIVELY PRODUCING LIGHT OLEFINS IN A FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. P.O. Box 2149 Baytown, TX 77522-2149 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. P.O. Box 2149 Baytown, TX 77522-2149 / US | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LADWIG, Paul, Kevin 9 Cottonwood Drive Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | 02 /
ASPLIN, John, Ernest 18822 Windward Lane Houston, TX 77058 / US | 03 /
STUNTZ, Gordon, Frederick 12217 Lake Lingham Circle Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 04 /
WACHTER, William, Augustine 14040 Eastridge Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | 05 /
HENRY, Brian, Erik 22807 Two Rivers Lane Katy, TX 77450-8684 / US | [2001/16] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
LADWIG, Paul, Kevin 9 Cottonwood Drive Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | ||
02 /
ASPLIN, John, Ernest 18822 Windward Lane Houston, TX 77058 / US | |||
03 /
STUNTZ, Gordon, Frederick 12217 Lake Lingham Circle Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | |||
04 /
WACHTER, William, Augustine 14040 Eastridge Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | |||
05 /
HENRY, Brian, Erik 17846 West Colony Way Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99920069.4 | 27.04.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US09113 | Priority number, date | US19980073085 | 05.05.1998 Original published format: US 73085 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957086 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077913 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C4/02, C07C4/04, C07C4/06, C10G11/05, C10G51/02 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
C10G57/02 (EP,US);
C07C4/02 (KR);
C10G51/023 (EP,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/09] | C07C4/02, C07C4/04, C07C4/06, C10G35/02, C10G35/04, C10G35/06, C10G35/095, C10G11/02, C10G11/04, C10G11/05, C10G51/02, C10G51/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN HERSTELLUNG VON LEICHTEN OLEFINEN IN EINEM KATALYTISCHEN CRACKVERFAHREN IN DER FLÜSSIGPHASE | [2001/09] | English: | PROCESS FOR SELECTIVELY PRODUCING LIGHT OLEFINS IN A FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING PROCESS | [2001/09] | French: | PROCEDE RELATIF A LA PRODUCTION SELECTIVE D'OLEFINES LEGERES DANS UN PROCESSUS DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE FLUIDE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 29.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 16.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2001 | 30.04.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3928172 (DAVIS JR FRANCIS E, et al); | [A]US4171257 (MAYER JEROME F [US], et al); | [A]US4282085 (O'REAR DENNIS J, et al); | [A]US4390413 (O'REAR DENNIS J, et al); | [A]US4502945 (OLBRICH HAZEL C [US], et al); | [A]US4865718 (HERBST JOSEPH A [US], et al); | [A]US5069776 (BISWAS JAYDEEP [NL], et al); | [A]US5160424 (LE Q N [US], et al); | [A]US5220089 (LE QUANG N [US], et al); | [A]US5372704 (HARANDI MOHSEN N [US], et al); | [A]US5472594 (TSANG CHIH-HAO M [US], et al); | [A]US5389232 (ADEWUYI YUSUF G [US], et al) |