Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6896715 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2005 | B2 | US2004089100 | 13.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61036103 | 30.06.2003 | US603001 | 07.12.2001 | US52231800 | 09.03.2000 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010043327 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4972249B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2012 | B2 | JP2003505586 | 12.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU747827B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2002 | B2 | AU3780499 | 23.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1082739 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2011 | B2 | EP1082739 | 16.02.2005 | B1 | EP1082739 | 14.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE289447T | 15.03.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9910241 | 21.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2331624 | 11.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69923773T | 19.01.2012 | T3 | DE69923773T | 05.01.2006 | T2 | DE69923773D1 | 24.03.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP99920263 | 03.05.1999 | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1037897 | 22.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL139430 | 25.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US9909576 | 03.05.1999 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6616728 | 09.09.2003 | B2 | US2002069724 | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US603001 | 07.12.2001 | US52231800 | 09.03.2000 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6338816 | 15.01.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US52231800 | 09.03.2000 | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9957739 | Global Dossier | 11.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010174377 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1252756C | 19.04.2006 | C | CN1307725 | 08.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ302337 | 16.03.2011 | B6 | CZ20004099 | 13.06.2001 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1082739E | 30.06.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2217832 | 27.11.2003 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6051044 | 18.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US7153798 | 04.05.1998 |