EP1079765 - RADIATION PROTECTIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fishman, Steven J. 18 Graystone Lane Weston, Massachusetts 02193 / US | [2005/32] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION 300 Longwood Avenue Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/32] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
FISHMAN, Steven, J. 18 Graystone Lane Weston, MA 02193 / US | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2001/10] | Application number, filing date | 99920412.6 | 07.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US10131 | Priority number, date | US19980080447 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: US 80447 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959501 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079765 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1079765 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A61N5/10 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0436 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0481 (EP,US);
A61F2/02 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | STRAHLUNGSSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | [2001/10] | English: | RADIATION PROTECTIVE DEVICE | [2001/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES RAYONS | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05013916.1 / EP1593407 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2005 | BE | 10.08.2005 | CH | 10.08.2005 | CY | 10.08.2005 | FI | 10.08.2005 | LI | 10.08.2005 | NL | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | SE | 10.11.2005 | ES | 21.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | LU | 07.05.2006 | IE | 08.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
LU | 07.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2151927 (MEDASIL) [A] 1-9,17,19-22,25,26,29 * figures 4-6 * * page 2, line 75 - line 84 * * page 2, line 105 - line 118 * * page 3, line 126 - page 4, line 18 *; | [A]US5344459 (SWARTZ STEPHEN J [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8,10,11,13,15,17-20,23,25-28 * figures 1-9 * * column 4, line 1 - line 23 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 7 *; | [A]US5496370 (HAMAS ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1,3,9-14,17,19,25,27,29 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 37 ** column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 27 *; | [XA]US5558829 (PETRICK TIMOTHY B [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,9,13,15,17,19,21,23,24 * figures 1,9,21 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 5 * * column 8, line 47 - line 60 * [A] 25,27,29 |