Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1085900

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 NL 
Examination procedure30.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase09.11.2000National basic fee paid 
09.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted10.06.2009
Opposition procedure11.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit published on 12.05.2010 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.03.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL
 
Event date:28.03.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20001109
 
Event date:05.11.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030917
 
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:USE OF ERYTHROPOIETIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF PRIMARY HAEMOCHROMATOSES
 
Event date:25.02.2009 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/18 20060101AFI20090120BHEP
 
Event date:25.02.2009 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 33/06 20060101ALI20090120BHEP
 
Event date:25.02.2009 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 33/42 20060101ALI20090120BHEP
 
Event date:10.06.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL
 
Event date:10.06.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.06.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:23.07.2009 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69940971
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20090723
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:22.07.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:10.08.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:14.08.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
 
Event date:13.10.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2326501 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:19.05.2010 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20100311
 
Event date:31.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:22.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:20.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180328
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20180322
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20180329
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20180323
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180320
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180409
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20180504
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20180425
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20180323
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180412
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20180417
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:09.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69940971 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:15.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:15.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20190409
 
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20190408
 
Event date:01.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190408
 
Event date:15.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 433323 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20190409
 
Event date:29.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:16.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20190409
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20190409
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20190408
 
Event date:04.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20200904
 
Event date:30.10.2020 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20190410
 
Event date:08.05.2009 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:06.04.2009 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:23.01.2009 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:09.02.2001 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:16.04.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:16.04.2010 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261