EP1070109 - SOLID LUBRICANTS WITH A TIN SULPHIDE AND CARBON BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemetall Ges.m.b.H. Kärntner Strasse 7 1010 Wien / AT | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜNER, Ronald Gerbergasse 11 A-9500 Villach / AT | 02 /
MELCHER, Bernhard St. Ruprechter Strasse 55/1 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | 03 /
MILCZARECK, Roman Chemetall Ges.mbH, Gailitz 195 9601 Arnoldstein / AT | 04 /
KIENLEITNER, Herbert Erlendorf 97 A-9587 Riegersdorf / AT | [2003/26] |
Former [2003/06] | 01 /
HÜNER, Ronald Gerbergasse 11 A-9500 Villach / AT | ||
02 /
MELCHER, Bernhard St. Ruprechter Strasse 55/1 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | |||
03 /
MILCZARECK, Roman Chemetall Ges.mbH, Gailitz 195 9601 Arnoldstein / AT | |||
04 /
KIENLEITNER, Herbert Erlendorf 7 A-9587 Riegersdorf / AT | |||
Former [2001/04] | 01 /
HÜNER, Ronald Gerbergasse 11 A-9500 Villach / AT | ||
02 /
MELCHER, Bernhard St. Ruprechter Strasse 55/1 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | |||
03 /
MILCZARECK, Roman Chemetall Ges.mbH, Gailitz 195 9601 Arnoldstein / AT | |||
04 /
KIENLEITNER, Herbert Erlendorf 97 A-9587 Riegersdorf / AT | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/04] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99920629.5 | 09.04.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999EP02426 | Priority number, date | DE1998115992 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19815992 | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952997 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070109 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070109 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10M103/00, C01G19/00, // (C10M103/00, 103:02, 103:06), C10M103:06,(C10N10/12, 30:06, 40:02, 50:08, 70:00) | [2001/04] | CPC: |
F16D69/02 (EP,US);
C10M3/00 (KR);
C01G19/00 (EP,US);
C10M103/00 (EP,US);
C10M103/06 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | FESTSCHMIERSTOFFE AUF BASIS VON ZINNSULFID UND KOHLENSTOFF | [2001/04] | English: | SOLID LUBRICANTS WITH A TIN SULPHIDE AND CARBON BASE | [2001/04] | French: | LUBRIFIANTS SOLIDES A BASE DE SULFURE D'ETAIN ET DE CARBONE | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 31.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 19.03.2003 | GR | 19.03.2003 | IE | 19.03.2003 | NL | 19.03.2003 | CY | 09.04.2003 | LU | 09.04.2003 | BE | 30.04.2003 | CH | 30.04.2003 | LI | 30.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
CY | 09.04.2003 | ||
LU | 09.04.2003 | ||
BE | 30.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
LU | 09.04.2003 | ||
BE | 30.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
BE | 30.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
NL | 19.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0108892 (NUKEM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 31 * [A] 2,3,6; | [A]CH644890 (LONZA AG [CH]) [A] 1,7 * page 2, column 2, line 15 - line 54 *; | [DA]DE3513031 (DOW CORNING GMBH) [DA] 7-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0328514 (BBU CHEMIE GMBH [AT]) [A] 7-10 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 29 *; | [A]US5288792 (BUXBAUM LOTHAR [AT]) [A] 7-10 * column 1, line 4 - line 24 ** column 2, line 40 - line 58 *; | [A]WO9502657 (BUXBAUM INGRID & HF [AT], et al) [A] 7-10 * page 4, paragraphs 1-4,6,7 *; | [A]EP0654616 (TEXTAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 7-10 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 8 * * page 3, line 57 - line 59 * |