06.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
10.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
21.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
16.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] |
09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
24.01.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] |
21.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
24.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
22.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
09.05.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
31.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
27.12.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
13.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] |
08.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] |
17.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|