Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | Lapse: 30.04.2003 | CH | Lapse: 30.04.2003 | CY | Lapse: 09.04.2003 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 19.06.2003 | ES | | FI | Lapse: 19.03.2003 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 19.03.2003 | IE | Lapse: 19.03.2003 | IT | | LI | Lapse: 30.04.2003 | LU | Lapse: 09.04.2003 | MC | Lapse: 30.04.2003 | NL | Lapse: 19.03.2003 | PT | Lapse: 20.06.2003 | SE | Lapse: 19.06.2003 | Examination procedure | 06.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | | 08.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 08.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | European patent granted | 19.03.2003 | Opposition procedure | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HUENER, RONALD | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MELCHER, BERNHARD | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MILCZARECK, ROMAN | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KIENLEITNER, HERBERT | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 27.03.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 24.04.2003 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59904628 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030424 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 24.01.2001 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 24.01.2001 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20001108 | | Event date: | 25.06.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HUENER, RONALD | | Event date: | 25.06.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MELCHER, BERNHARD | | Event date: | 25.06.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MILCZARECK, ROMAN | | Event date: | 25.06.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KIENLEITNER, HERBERT | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 16.04.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | GERMAN | | Event date: | 01.09.2003 | | Event description: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Event date: | 28.05.2003 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20030502 | | Event date: | 22.08.2003 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 16.10.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2192846 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D 1070109E IE | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Event date: | 15.12.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 10.03.2004 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20031222 | | Event date: | 31.10.2003 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | *CHEMETALL GES.M.B.H. | Effective DATE: | 20030430 | | Event date: | 30.04.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030430 | | Event date: | 30.04.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030430 | | Event date: | 09.04.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030409 | | Event date: | 19.06.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030619 | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030319 | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030319 | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030319 | | Event date: | 30.04.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030430 | | Event date: | 09.04.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030409 | | Event date: | 30.04.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030430 | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030319 | | Event date: | 20.06.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030620 | | Event date: | 19.06.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030619 | | Event date: | 29.02.2012 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110409 | | Event date: | 31.01.2013 | | Event description: | PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Effective DATE: | 20121207 | | Event date: | 08.05.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 59904628 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER, DE | | Event date: | 18.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | OWNER: | TRIBOTECC GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20130606 | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 59904628 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130508 | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59904628 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | TRIBOTECC GMBH, AT | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: CHEMETALL GES.MBH, WIEN, AT | Effective DATE: | 20130508 | | Event date: | 26.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | OWNER: | TRIBOTECC GMBH, AT | Effective DATE: | 20130625 | | Event date: | 28.08.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130801 AND 20130807 | | Event date: | 15.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT PC 234907 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER | OWNER: | TRIBOTECC GMBH, AT | Effective DATE: | 20130429 | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 59904628 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECH, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130508 | | Event date: | 22.04.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 59904628 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND , DE | Effective DATE: | 20130508 | | Event date: | 24.04.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 24.04.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20180427 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20180523 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20180418 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20180424 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20180420 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.10.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20180403 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 09.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 59904628 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 01.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20190408 | | Event date: | 15.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK07 234907 AT T | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY | Effective DATE: | 20190409 | | Event date: | 31.10.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20190408 | | Event date: | 02.09.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20200902 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20190410 | | Event date: | 31.01.2003 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 13.12.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 26.07.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 08.12.2000 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 24.01.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 24.01.2004 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |