blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0988206

EP0988206 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OR REGULATING AN EDDY-CURRENT BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SAUMWEBER, Eckart
Mühlstrasse 15
D-82131 Gauting / DE
02 / LEHMANN, Henry
Rudolf-Breitscheid-Strasse 16A
D-08062 Zwickau / DE
03 / GRAUTSTÜCK, Heinrich
Werner-Friedmann-Bogen 28
D-80993 München / DE
[2000/13]
Application number, filing date99920676.615.04.1999
[2000/13]
WO1999EP02537
Priority number, dateDE199811723317.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19817233
[2000/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9954184
Date:28.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0988206
Date:29.03.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0988206
Date:10.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:B61H7/08
[2000/13]
CPC:
B61H7/083 (EP); B61H7/08 (KR); B60L2200/26 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/13]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG ODER REGELUNG EINER WIRBELSTROMBREMSE[2000/13]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OR REGULATING AN EDDY-CURRENT BRAKE[2000/13]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA COMMANDE OU LA REGULATION D'UN FREIN A COURANTS PARASITES[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
14.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2003Fee for grant paid
11.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2098116  (BAERMANN MAX) [A] 1 * page 8, line 3 - page 13, line 15; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]EP0724998  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [A]WO9632172  (FUNEX AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 13, line 30 - page 14, line 12; figures 1-11 *
by applicantDE19618903
    - DR WOLFGANG, NEUE BREMSSYSTEME ALS INTEGRALER BESTANDTEIL INOVATIVER FAHR-, ZEUGKONZEPTE" ZEV&DET GLASERS ANALEN (1997), no. 2/3, page 121-128
    - HENDRICHS W, "Versuche mit linearen Wirbelstrombremsen - Messungen mechan- ische Grössen", ZEV GLAS.ANN 109 (1985), no. 9, page 375-381
    - HENDRICHS, W, "Versuche mit linearen Wirbelstrombremsenelektrischer Teil", EB 83 (1985), no. 10
    - HENDRICHS W, "Das thermischfe Verhalten der Wirbelstrombremse", EB 84 (1986), no. 5
    - DOBLER R, "Die lineare Wirbelstrombremse - Erkenntnisse", VERSUCHSENSATZ BEI DER DEUTSCHFEN BUNDESBAHN, ETR 37 (1988), no. 1/2
    - KRöGER U, "Prinzip, Entwicklung ung konstrukion der linearen Wirbelstrom- bremsen", ZEV GLASERS ANNALEN 109 (1985), no. 9
    - KRöGER U, "Bremseinrichtungen im ICE", ETR 38 (1989), no. 9
    - HENDRICHS W, "Bremstechnische Versuche mit dem ICE-Vaus hohen Geschwindig- keiten", ETR 37 (1989), no. 1/2
    - VAN OOSTVEEN, H, "Erfahrungen mit Permanentmagnetschienenbremsen", ZEV & DEV GLAS.ANN 121, 1997, no. 12, page 613-617
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.