EP1080555 - METHOD OF SYNCHRONISATION OF A BASE STATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESBY, P., Nokia Telecommunications OY Keilalahdentie 4 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | 02 /
ESSER, A., Nokia Telecommunications OY Keilalahdentie 4 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | [2009/33] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
WESBY, P., Nokia Telecommunications OY Keilalahdentie 4 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
ESSER, A., Nokia Telecommunications OY Keilalahde ntie 4 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99920839.0 | 03.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999EP02995 | Priority number, date | FI19980000979 | 04.05.1998 Original published format: FI 980979 | GB19980022965 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: GB 9822965 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957826 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080555 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080555 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04B7/26 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H04J3/0652 (EP,US);
H04B7/2696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG EINES BASISSTATIONENNETZWERKS | [2001/10] | English: | METHOD OF SYNCHRONISATION OF A BASE STATION NETWORK | [2001/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNCHRONISATION D'UN RESEAU DE STATIONS DE BASE | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.08.2009 | [2011/28] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5519759 (HEINECK FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-33 * column A * * column 5, line 64 - column 9, line 10 * | [XA] - JUSTIN C -I CHUANG, "AUTONOMOUS TIME SYNCHRONIZATION AMONG RADIO PORTS IN WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, (19940201), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 27 - 32, XP000450943 [X] 1-8,10-27,29-33 * abstract * * page 28, column 1, line 45 - page 30, column 2, line 11 * [A] 9,28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.282262 | [XA] - YOSHIHIKO AKAIWA ET AL, "AUTONOMOUS DECENTRALIZED INTER-BASE-STATION SYNCHRONIZATION FOR TDMA MICROCELLULAR SYSTEMS", 1991 IEEE 41TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, ST. LOUIS, MAY 19 - 22, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910519), no. CONF. 41, ISBN 0-87942-582-2, pages 257 - 262, XP000260188 [X] 1-8,10-27,29-33 * abstract * * part II * [A] 9,28 | [A] - ARIYAVISITAKUL S ET AL, "NETWORK SYNCHRONISATION OF RADIO PORTS IN WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19921203), vol. 28, no. 25, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 2312 - 2314, XP000332623 [A] 1-33 * abstract * * page 2312, column 2, line 11 - page 2313, column 1, line 6 * * page 2313, column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 26 * |