EP1098701 - ZINC ALUMINATE WITH HIGH SPECIFIC SURFACE AREA, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE FOR TREATING MOTOR VEHICLE EXHAUST GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92400 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDOUIN, Catherine 1, rue des Jacinthes F-60270 Gouvieux / FR | 02 /
SEGUELONG, Thierry 8, rue Rouget de L'Isle F-92800 Puteaux / FR | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Dubruc, Philippe, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Dubruc, Philippe, et al Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99920906.7 | 21.05.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999FR01210 | Priority number, date | FR19980006610 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9806610 | [2001/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961150 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098701 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/06, B01D53/56, B01D53/94 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B01D53/9418 (EP);
B01J23/06 (EP,KR);
B01D2251/2062 (EP);
B01D2251/208 (EP);
B01D2255/2025 (EP);
B01D2255/2065 (EP);
B01D2255/20707 (EP);
B01D2255/20792 (EP);
B01D2255/2092 (EP);
B01D2255/30 (EP);
B01D2258/012 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | ZINKALUMINAT MIT HOHER SPEZIFISCHER OBERFLÄCHE, DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN AUTOABGASBEHANDLUNG | [2001/20] | English: | ZINC ALUMINATE WITH HIGH SPECIFIC SURFACE AREA, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE FOR TREATING MOTOR VEHICLE EXHAUST GASES | [2001/20] | French: | ALUMINATE DE ZINC A SURFACE SPECIFIQUE ELEVES, SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'AUTOMOBILE | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/34] | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH07149519 ; | [A]EP0676232 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 1,16-20 * claims 1-9 * * column 1, line 25 - line 47 *; | [A]US3904553 (CAMPBELL LARRY E, et al) | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 32, Database accession no. 95-243517, XP002091267 & JPH07149519 A 19950613 (KAWAKEN FINE CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,8 * abstract * [A] 10,12,14 | [XA] - INOUE, MASASHI ET AL, "Synthesis of double oxides having spinel structure (zinc aluminate, zinc gallate) by the glycothermal method", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910826), vol. 115, no. 8, Database accession no. 77073, XP002091651 [X] 1-5,7,8 * abstract * [A] 10,12,14 | [ ] - NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1991), no. 7, pages 1036 - 1038 | [A] - VALENZUELA M.A.; BOSCH P.; AGUILAR-RIOS G.; MONTOYA A.; SCHIFTER I., "Comparison between sol-gel, coprecipitation and wet mixing synthesis of ZnAl2O4", JOURNAL OF SOL-GEL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., DORDRECHT NL, (1997), vol. 8, no. 1-3, pages 107 - 110, XP002091286 [A] 1-5,7,8,10,12-15 * page 107, column 2, line 3 - line 9 * * page 108, column 1, line 10 - page 109, column 1, line 4 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1026471709899 | [A] - OTERO AREAN, C. ET AL, "Preparation and characterization of spinel-type high surface area Al2O3-ZnAl2O4 mixed metal oxides by an alkoxide route", MICROPOROUS MATERIALS, (1997), vol. 8, no. 3,4, pages 187 - 192, XP002091650 [A] 1-5,7,8,10,12,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-6513(96)00073-9 |