EP1082710 - PRELOADED IC-CARD AND METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Communications S.A. 70, rue duGrand Pré 1211 Geneve / CH | [2001/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMBOIS, Etienne 5, lotissement Plein Soleil F-26110 Montmeyran / FR | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clementy 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2001/11] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile c/o Griffes Consulting S.A. Route de Florissant 81 1206 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 99921050.3 | 01.06.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999IB00977 | Priority number, date | EP19980110350 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98110350 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9964996 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082710 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/40975 (EP);
G07F7/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | AUFGELADENE CHIPKARTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG DERSELBEN | [2001/11] | English: | PRELOADED IC-CARD AND METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING THE SAME | [2001/11] | French: | CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE PRECHARGEE ET PROCEDE D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UNE TELLE CARTE | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 03.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0817420 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 18 * * column 7, line 27 - column 11, line 41 * [Y] 2; | [XA]EP0727894 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 16, line 29 - column 17, line 48 * [A] 4,9-11; | [XP]EP0856820 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [XP] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 53 * * column 4, line 13 - line 51 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 36 *; | [YA]DE4442357 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 31 * [A] 1,10; | [YA]EP0789335 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 58 * [A] 9; | [A]DE19506921 (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 5,12-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - line 61 *; | [A]WO9320538 (TELSTRA CORP LTD [AU], et al) [A] 3,8,19 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - page 9, line 11 *; | [A]FR2681165 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 3,8,19 * abstract * * page 1, line 24 - page 5, line 30 *; | [A]EP0398545 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 6 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - line 38 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 8 *; | [AD]FR2580834 (GRANDMOUGIN MICHEL [FR]) [AD] 7 * abstract * * page 1, line 2 - page 5, line 15 *; | [A]US5602918 (CHEN JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 10 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 56 * | [Y] - O'MAHONY, PIERCE, TEWARI, Electronic Payment Systems, 1997, ARTECH HOUSE, INC., XP002113876 [Y] 2 * page 25, paragraph 3.2.2 * | by applicant | DE2560080 | DE2512935 | WO9721197 | US4710613 | WO9424673 | FR2580834 | US5572004 |