EP1076629 - ORIFICE REDUCER FOR MULTI-COMPARTMENT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-L Management Corp. 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 / US | [2001/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERMAN, Adam One Kilmer Road Larchmont, NY 10538 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99921386.1 | 12.04.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999US08269 | Priority number, date | US19980067047 | 27.04.1998 Original published format: US 67047 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955598 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076629 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32, B65D47/06 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
B65D81/3283 (EP,US);
B65D47/06 (EP,US);
B05C17/0052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | ÖFFNUNGSVERKLEINERER FÜR MEHRKAMMER-VERPACKUNG | [2001/08] | English: | ORIFICE REDUCER FOR MULTI-COMPARTMENT CONTAINER | [2001/08] | French: | REDUCTEUR D'ORIFICE D'UN CONTENANT A PLUSIEURS COMPARTIMENTS | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4219598 (CREATECHNIC AG DIETLIKON [CH]) [X] 1-6,9-14 * figures 1,9,10 *; | [X]US5588561 (NESS RICHARD B [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-11,13,14 * column 5, line 3 - line 24; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US5289950 (GENTILE JAMES L [US]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * figures 2,3 * |