EP1075605 - SPLIT BEARING ARRANGEMENT IN A MACHINE HOUSING, ESPECIALLY A CRANKSHAFT SLIDING BEARING FOR RECIPROCATING PISTON MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIMMER, Rudolf Tröstlberg 74 A-4431 Haidershofen / AT | 02 /
MAYR, Karl Wanzenöd 54 A-4441 Behamberg / AT | 03 /
MALISCHEW, Franz Fachschulstrasse 16 A-4400 Steyr / AT | 04 /
KEBER, Andreas Wagnerstrasse 13 A-4400 Steyr / AT | 05 /
LUCHNER, Clemens Hasenweg 9 D-85598 Baldham / DE | [2001/07] | Application number, filing date | 99922093.2 | 12.04.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999EP02443 | Priority number, date | DE1998119081 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19819081 | [2001/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956028 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075605 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075605 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16C9/02 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
F16C9/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/07] | Title | German: | GETEILTE LAGERANORDNUNG IN EINEM GEHÄUSE, INSBESONDERE KURBELWELLEN-GLEITLAGER FÜR HUBKOLBENMASCHINEN | [2001/07] | English: | SPLIT BEARING ARRANGEMENT IN A MACHINE HOUSING, ESPECIALLY A CRANKSHAFT SLIDING BEARING FOR RECIPROCATING PISTON MACHINES | [2001/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE PALIER DIVISE, PLACE DANS UN BOITIER, NOTAMMENT PALIER LISSE DE VILEBREQUIN POUR MOTEURS A PISTON ALTERNATIF | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 28.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2327440 (STORK WERKSPOOR DIESEL BV [NL]) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1319736 (SULZER AG) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0882901 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE19645691 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19535497 (AUDI AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19535497 |