EP1098735 - GRINDING SPINDLE UNIT WITH MAGNETIC DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erwin Junker Maschinenfabrik GmbH Junkerstrasse 2 77787 Nordrach / DE | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNKER, Erwin Kappelwindeckstrasse 95d D-77815 Bühl / DE | 02 /
LINDNER, Jürgen Lützentaler Strasse 1-5 D-63868 Grosswallstadt / DE | [2002/35] |
Former [2001/20] | 01 /
JUNKER, Erwin Kappelwindeckstrasse 95d D-77815 Bühl / DE | ||
02 /
LINDNER, Jürgen Lützentaler Strasse 1-5 D-63868 Gro wallstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Leske, Thomas, et al Frohwitter Patentanwalt Postfach 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Leske, Thomas, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kanzlei FROHWITTER, Postfach 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Leske, Thomas, Dr. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99922096.5 | 14.04.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP02524 | Priority number, date | DE1998133241 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19833241 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005033 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098735 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098735 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24B47/12, B23Q5/10, B24B41/04, B24B19/12 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B24B19/12 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q5/10 (EP,US);
B24B41/04 (EP,US);
B24B47/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/20] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFSPINDELEINHEIT MIT MAGNETISCHEM ANTRIEB | [2001/20] | English: | GRINDING SPINDLE UNIT WITH MAGNETIC DRIVE | [2001/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE BROCHE PORTE-MEULE A ENTRAINEMENT MAGNETIQUE | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8201149 (CHASE DIAMOND TOOLS [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 5 - line 14; figure - *; | [A]EP0583035 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | DE4137924 | DE4426453 | DE19635687 |