EP1078037 - Alcoholic beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/09] | A BEVERAGE | ||
[2002/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coors Worldwide, Inc. 311, 10th Street Golden, Colorado 80401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Coors Worldwide, Inc. 311, 10th Street Golden, Colorado 80401 / US | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Brandbrew SA Rue Goethe, 11, BP 1107 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCULLION, Simon Daniel 25 Ratcliff Avenue, Branston Burton-on-Trent, Staffordshire DE13 3DA / GB | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99922321.7 | 14.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999GB01546 | Priority number, date | GB19980010310 | 15.05.1998 Original published format: GB 9810310 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960091 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078037 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078037 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12H1/18 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
C12H1/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | Alkoholisches Getränk | [2002/03] | English: | Alcoholic beverage | [2002/03] | French: | Boisson alcoholique | [2002/03] |
Former [2001/09] | EIN GETRÄNK | ||
Former [2001/09] | A BEVERAGE | ||
Former [2001/09] | BOISSON | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.11.2002 | BE | 06.11.2002 | CH | 06.11.2002 | FI | 06.11.2002 | FR | 06.11.2002 | GR | 06.11.2002 | IT | 06.11.2002 | LI | 06.11.2002 | NL | 06.11.2002 | DK | 06.02.2003 | PT | 06.02.2003 | SE | 06.02.2003 | DE | 07.02.2003 | CY | 14.05.2003 | IE | 14.05.2003 | LU | 14.05.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
FR | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
DK | 06.02.2003 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
CY | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
LU | 14.05.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
FR | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
CY | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
LU | 14.05.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
CY | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
LU | 14.05.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
CY | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
LU | 14.05.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
CY | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
DE | 07.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 06.11.2002 | |
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 06.11.2002 | |
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 06.02.2003 | |
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 06.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS4610033B ; | [X]US3826829 (MARULICH A) [X] 1-4,11,13,16-18,20,23,25,39-41,44-49 * column 2, line 16 - line 32 * * column 4, line 1 - line 8 * * column 4, line 57 - line 62 *; | [A]EP0268097 (HEUBLEIN INC [US]) [A] 1-50 * page 2, line 4 - line 6; claims 1,15 * * page 3, line 3 - line 17 *; | [A]EP0683224 (BASS PLC [GB]) [A] 1,4,17,18 * column 1, line 1 - line 4; claims 1,10 ** column 2, line 2 - line 8 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1971-19784S, XP002119404 & JPS4610033B B1 00000000 (MORINAGA MILK INDS CO LTD) [X] 1-4,16-18,20,39-41,44,47-49 * abstract * |