05.06.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
27.06.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
20.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.05.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.02.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.10.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
30.05.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
23.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.09.2004 |
First examination report |
|
10.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.12.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
19.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |
16.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |
07.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|