Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000206649 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16931998 | 02.06.1998 | JP14360099 | 24.05.1999 | JP34111598 | 13.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3958399 | Global Dossier | 20.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16931998 | 02.06.1998 | JP34111598 | 13.11.1998 | JP9902903 | 01.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1089123 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | B1 | EP1089123 | 05.02.2003 | A4 | EP1089123 | 04.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP16931998 | 02.06.1998 | JP34111598 | 13.11.1998 | JP9902903 | 01.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69939215D1 | 11.09.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP16931998 | 02.06.1998 | JP34111598 | 13.11.1998 | JP9902903 | 01.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6659381 | 09.12.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP16931998 | 02.06.1998 | JP34111598 | 13.11.1998 | JP9902903 | 01.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9963403 | Global Dossier | 09.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP16931998 | 02.06.1998 | JP34111598 | 13.11.1998 |