EP1089123 - LIGHT SHIELDING CLOTH FOR PHOTOGRAPHIC FILM CARTRIDGE AND PHOTOGRAPHIC FILM CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSURUMAKI, Satoru Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | 02 /
IMAI, Akio Kanematsu Corporation Seabance N-Kan 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8005 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99922610.3 | 01.06.1999 | [2001/14] | WO1999JP02903 | Priority number, date | JP19980169319 | 02.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16931998 | JP19980341115 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: JP 34111598 | [2001/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963403 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089123 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089123 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03C3/00 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G03C3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/14] | Title | German: | LICHTUNDURCHLÄSSIGES GEWEBE FÜR PHOTOGRAPHISCHE FILMPATRONEN UND PHOTOGRAPHISCHE FILMPATRONE | [2001/14] | English: | LIGHT SHIELDING CLOTH FOR PHOTOGRAPHIC FILM CARTRIDGE AND PHOTOGRAPHIC FILM CARTRIDGE | [2001/14] | French: | ECRAN ANTI-LUMIERE TEXTILE POUR CARTOUCHE DE FILM PHOTOGRAPHIQUE ET CARTOUCHE DE FILM PHOTOGRAPHIQUE AINSI OBTENUE | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2000 | Translation filed | 04.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 15.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0452900 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 3, line 45 - line 57 * * examples 12,13 * * claims 1,5-10,12,13,18 *; | [Y]EP0217227 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph L * * claims 1,2,4,13 * | International search | [X]JPH01254952 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]JPH06295025 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09120116 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JPS6257255U |