EP1085083 - CULTURE MEDIUM FOR CULTURING OF ANIMAL CELLS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROTEINS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/12] | MEDIA FOR CULTURING ANIMAL CELLS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN BY USING THE SAME | ||
[2007/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [2007/18] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBUYA, Kazushi, Chugai Seiyaku K. K. 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 02 /
ATSUMI, Masaru, Chugai Seiyaku K. K. 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 03 /
TSUNAKAWA, Shigeyuki, Chugai Seiyaku K. K. 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 04 /
NOGAKI, Kaneo, Chugai Seiyaku K. K. 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/12] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99922611.1 | 01.06.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999JP02904 | Priority number, date | JP19980150957 | 01.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15095798 | [2001/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963058 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085083 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085083 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, C12P21/00 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
C12P21/00 (EP,US);
C12N5/00 (KR);
C12N5/0018 (EP,US);
C12N2500/40 (EP,US);
C12N2500/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | KULTURMEDIUM ZUR KULTIVIERUNG TIERISCHER ZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROTEINEN DURCH DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2001/43] | English: | CULTURE MEDIUM FOR CULTURING OF ANIMAL CELLS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROTEINS USING THE SAME | [2007/18] | French: | MILIEU DE CULTURE POUR CULTURE DE CELLULES ANIMALES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PROTEINES EN UTILISANT CE MILIEU | [2001/43] |
Former [2001/12] | MEDIEN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON TIERISCHEN ZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PROTEINS DURCH DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2001/12] | MEDIA FOR CULTURING ANIMAL CELLS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN BY USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2001/12] | MILIEU DE CULTURE DE CELLULES ANIMALES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PROTEINES EN UTILISANT CE MILIEU | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2000 | Translation filed | 22.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | LU | 01.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | FI | 02.05.2007 | |
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 02.05.2007 | |
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0239882 ; | [A]CN1157694 ; | [A]US3856627 (NAGASAWA T, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1 - column 3, line 12 * * example 1 *; | [X]WO9523212 (SEA RUN HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900423), vol. 014, no. 197, Database accession no. (C - 0712), & JP02039882 A 19900208 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 40, Database accession no. 2001-375305 [40], XP002214165 & CN1157694 A 19970827 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS4954581 ; | [Y]JPH01148181 (JGC CORP); | [Y]JPH0239882 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0638704 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD) |