08.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
07.03.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
30.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
30.03.2007 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
24.03.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.03.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.11.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.01.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.09.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] |
11.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
02.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
11.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2001 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|