EP1018896 - NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF PRESSURE ULCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Postbus 1 2700 MA Zoetermeer / NL | [2011/29] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Postbus 1 2700 MA Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERHEUL-KOOT, Maria, Anna Broeksloot 10 NL-3474 HP Zegveld / NL | 02 /
KLEIJER, Chantal, Nelleke Afrikalaan 114 NL-2622 LR Delft / NL | 03 /
HAGEMAN, Robert, Johan, Joseph Weideroom 52 NL-2742 EV Waddinxveen / NL | 04 /
BORK, Roelof, André Biggenweide 43 NL-2727 GR Zoetermeer / NL | 05 /
GOETHALS, Maud Oudekamp 21 NL-3512 KG Utrecht / NL | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/29] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99922654.1 | 12.05.1999 | [2000/29] | WO1999NL00295 | Priority number, date | EP19980201576 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: EP 98201576 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958000 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018896 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018896 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/305, A23L1/302, A23L1/304, A61K31/195 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A61K33/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/155 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/01 (EP,US);
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K38/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/01, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/045, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/02, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/0606, A23V2250/0632 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1614, A23V2250/1582, A23V2250/16, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/1618, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1598, A23V2250/156 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/704, A23V2250/71, A23V2250/705, A23V2250/70 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/06, A23V2250/2116, A23V2250/0612, A23V2250/0644, A23V2250/304, A23V2250/156 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/06, A23V2250/2116, A23V2250/0612, A23V2250/0644, A23V2250/304, A23V2250/211, A23V2250/156 (US,EP)
(-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Extension states | SI | 13.01.2000 | Title | German: | ERNÄHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEKUBITALGESCHWÜREN | [2000/29] | English: | NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF PRESSURE ULCERS | [2000/29] | French: | COMPOSITION NUTRITIVE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES ESCARRES | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 08.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2010 | 20.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10184241.7 / EP2277394 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2002 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | [2012/31] |
Former [2012/12] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 20.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0367724 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-12* claim - *; | [A]EP0641562 (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]EP0674902 (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [A] 1-12 * example 1; claim - *; | [XA]WO9602137 (UNIV WAKE FOREST [US]) [X] 1 * example 1; claim - * [A] 2-12; | [A]US5733884 (BARBUL ADRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * examples 1,2; claim - * | Examination | - FRIAS SORIANO L, LAGE VAZQUEZ M A ET AL., "The effectiveness of oral nutritional supplementation in the healing of pressure ulcers", JOURNAL OF WOUND CARE, (20040930), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 319 - 323 | by applicant | EP0367724 | US5053387 | WO9316595 | EP0564804 | WO9602137 | WO9608966 | US5656588 | US5733884 |