EP1077646 - REUSABLE AUTOMATED BIOPSY NEEDLE HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL DEVICE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3600 S.W. 47th Avenue Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERWILLIGER, Richard, A. 443 Old Waterbury Road Southbury, CO 06488 / US | [2001/17] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
TERWILLIGER, Richard, A. 332 Ute Lane Estes Park, CO 80517 / US | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2004/18] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2001/09] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99922951.1 | 11.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US10376 | Priority number, date | US19980076181 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: US 76181 | US19980132941 | 11.08.1998 Original published format: US 132941 | US19980170893 | 13.10.1998 Original published format: US 170893 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958064 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077646 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0208 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0225 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | GRIFF FÜR WIEDERVERWENDBARE AUTOMATISIERTE BIOPSIENADEL | [2001/09] | English: | REUSABLE AUTOMATED BIOPSY NEEDLE HANDLE | [2001/09] | French: | POIGNEE D'AIGUILLE DE BIOPSIE AUTOMATISEE REUTILISABLE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5551442 (KANNER ROWLAND W [US], et al) [A] 1,3-6 * abstract ** column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 19; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9749339 (MEDICAL DEVICE TECH [US]) [X] 1-6,28 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 25 * * page 9, line 21 - page 19, line 18; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US4699154 (LINDGREN PER G [SE]); | [Y]US4958625 (BATES JAMES S [US], et al); | [Y]US5025797 (BARAN GREGORY W [US]) |