Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3985799 | Global Dossier | 06.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9910444 | 18.05.1999 | US8597498 | 19.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1077696 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9910444 | 18.05.1999 | US8597498 | 19.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2333190 | 25.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9910444 | 18.05.1999 | US8597498 | 19.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9959579 | Global Dossier | 25.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8597498 | 19.05.1998 |